Electrical Engineering - Quantities and Units - Discussion

Discussion Forum : Quantities and Units - General Questions (Q.No. 1)
1.
When these numbers are multiplied, (6 × 103) (5 × 105), the result is
3 × 108
30 × 108
300 × 109
3,000 × 107
Answer: Option
Explanation:
No answer description is available. Let's discuss.
Discussion:
49 comments Page 5 of 5.

Kapil Dixit said:   1 decade ago
Because of both digits (6 and 5) are multiply directly with each other while the powers of multiplier will be additive.

Tharanya said:   1 decade ago
(6*5)*(10^(5+3))=30*10^8

In mathematical problem, the numbers are multiplied, power are added and finally multiply both.

Ezman Ezra said:   1 decade ago
6*10^3=6000 and 5*10^5=500000

When you multiply the answers you have 3000000000, there4 this can be written as

3*10^9 or 30*10^8

Kunal said:   1 decade ago
In mathematical problem, the numbers are multiplied & powers are added.

Therefore, 6*5=30 & 10^3+5=8 so, 30*10^8.

Kitty said:   1 decade ago
If the numbers are mulitiplied the exponents are added.

Thanks for discussion.

Murali said:   1 decade ago
Simply, the numbers 6 and 5 normal multiplication (6*5=30).

In power the numbers has been added (3+5=8).

Rameshbabu said:   1 decade ago
Thank you for easy understandable explanation.

Ashik said:   1 decade ago
(a^m)*(a^n)=a^(m+n)
[p*(a^m)]*[q*(a^n)]=(p*q)*[a^(m+n)]

Therefore (6 x 10^3)*(5 x 10^5)=(6*5)*10^(3+5)
=30*10^8

Mahalakshmi said:   1 decade ago
Powers are added during multiplication so 6*5=30.

10^3+5=10^8 therefore 30*10^8.


Post your comments here:

Your comments will be displayed after verification.