# Aptitude - Numbers - Discussion

Discussion Forum : Numbers - General Questions (Q.No. 2)
2.
(112 x 54) = ?
67000
70000
76500
77200
Explanation:
 (112 x 54) = 112 x 10 4 = 112 x 104 = 1120000 = 70000 2 24 16
Discussion:
115 comments Page 2 of 12.

Mahesh Sniper said:   3 years ago
112 * (5*5*5*5*).
112 * 625 = 70000.

Akash said:   3 years ago
= (112 * 5^4).
= 112 * 625,
= 70000.

Rocky said:   3 years ago
(112 * 25 * 25) = 70000.

Ravinder said:   3 years ago
(112 * 25 * 25) = 70000.

G.manoj said:   4 years ago
5^4 = 5 * 5 * 5 * 5, 5 * 5 = 25.

So, 25 * 25 = 625 we can split 112 = 100 + 10 + 2 then;

100 * 625 = 62500,
10 * 625 = 6250,
2 * 625 = 1250 and finally answer is 62500 + 6250 + 1250 = 70000.

Bhargav said:   4 years ago
112 can be written as 7 * 2^4 so (2^4)*(5^4) gives you 4 zeros.

Tony said:   4 years ago
Hi @Ravi.

How we can take it as 50/2 could you please explain it? Then it will become (25) ^4.

Arjun Reddy said:   4 years ago
(112*25*25) = 70000.

Manish pandey said:   4 years ago
(112 x 54) = 112 x 10 4 =112 x 104 = 1120000 = 70000.

Js parihar said:   4 years ago
By digit sum it can be more easier:

112 * 625 = 4 * 13 = 4 * 4 =>16 = 7.
digit sum of option will be;
70000 = 7.