Aptitude - Numbers - Discussion

Discussion Forum : Numbers - General Questions (Q.No. 2)
2.
(112 x 54) = ?
67000
70000
76500
77200
Answer: Option
Explanation:
(112 x 54) = 112 x 10 4 = 112 x 104 = 1120000 = 70000
2 24 16
Discussion:
121 comments Page 1 of 13.

Ramya said:   1 decade ago
I want any more explanation.

Tejas said:   1 decade ago
This is the best method.

Ramu said:   1 decade ago
I want easy and simple method.

Santhi said:   1 decade ago
(4*4*7)*25*25
(4*25)*(4*25)*7=70000

Tamilarasi said:   1 decade ago
How to put 10/2.......
If you write 10/2 means this ans is 5
In these sums easy way to get the ans.
eg:25 means 50/2.

112*10*10*10*10
_______________ = 70,000

2*2*2*2

Arun raj said:   1 decade ago
112*5*5*5*5 = 70000
simple:-)

Suresh kumar said:   1 decade ago
I want more explanations.

RAVI SHASTRI said:   1 decade ago
SANTHI YOUR METHOD IS BEST

Ananya said:   1 decade ago
112 x 5^4 = (2^4 * 7) * 5^4
= 2^4 * 5^4 * 7
= (2*5)^4 * 7
= 10^4 * 7
= 70000
(1)

Phani Gorantla said:   1 decade ago
Here we can apply 2*5 as a zero technique
for ex 2*2^2*5^2

Now ans is 200(i.e in this pbm two 2's two 5 combination is there thats why i just put two zeros after 2.

Now the given pbm i converted into 2's and 5's combination
(112)*5^4
(7*2^4)*5^4
i.e 7*(2^4*5^4)ans is 70000(4 zeros added after 7 because four 2's and 5's combinations are there)


Post your comments here:

Your comments will be displayed after verification.