# Aptitude - Numbers - Discussion

Discussion Forum : Numbers - General Questions (Q.No. 125)

125.

The unit digit in the product (784 x 618 x 917 x 463) is:

Answer: Option

Explanation:

Unit digit in the given product = Unit digit in (4 x 8 x 7 x 3) = (672) = 2

Discussion:

11 comments Page 1 of 2.
Azeem said:
8 months ago

(784 x 618 x 917 x 463)=?

Simply take the unit number from every number eg:784(4 is the unit number)

4 x 8 =32.

7 x 3 =21.

And simply take these two of the unit numbers eg:32(2 is unit number).

2 x 1=2.

The answer is 2.

Simply take the unit number from every number eg:784(4 is the unit number)

4 x 8 =32.

7 x 3 =21.

And simply take these two of the unit numbers eg:32(2 is unit number).

2 x 1=2.

The answer is 2.

Sneka said:
3 years ago

Thank you for all your explanation. I understand well.

Pritha Sarkar said:
4 years ago

Thank you all for explaining the answer.

Swar said:
4 years ago

@Neelam.

To solve this problem, we should individually divide powers of the numbers by 4, then the reminder should be taken as power for the last digit of the given number.

345/4. Reminder=1.

Unit digit of 236^345=6^ (reminder) =6^1=6.

Similarly, 144/4. Rem=0.

Unit digit of 347^144=7^0=1.

To solve this problem, we should individually divide powers of the numbers by 4, then the reminder should be taken as power for the last digit of the given number.

345/4. Reminder=1.

Unit digit of 236^345=6^ (reminder) =6^1=6.

Similarly, 144/4. Rem=0.

Unit digit of 347^144=7^0=1.

Neelam said:
8 years ago

How solve 236^345 and 347^144 for find unit digit?

Rajat said:
8 years ago

Concentrate on last line multiply unit digit of respective numbers.

Narasingarao said:
9 years ago

Dear @Rama,

784*618 8*4=32 unit place is 2 then, multiply 2*917.

-------

2*917 7*2=14 unit place is 4 then, multiply 4*463.

-------

4*463 3*4=12 unit place is 2.

-------

2 is the answer.

784*618 8*4=32 unit place is 2 then, multiply 2*917.

-------

2*917 7*2=14 unit place is 4 then, multiply 4*463.

-------

4*463 3*4=12 unit place is 2.

-------

2 is the answer.

Jijo said:
1 decade ago

unit digit means last digit.

for finding the unit digit,we need only last digit of each numbers.

So 784*618*917*463 = 4*8*7*3 (for finding unit place digit)

For simply, multiply one by one

4*8=32(unit digit is 2)

2*7=14(unit digit is 4)

4*3=12(unit digit is 2)

2 is the answer

for finding the unit digit,we need only last digit of each numbers.

So 784*618*917*463 = 4*8*7*3 (for finding unit place digit)

For simply, multiply one by one

4*8=32(unit digit is 2)

2*7=14(unit digit is 4)

4*3=12(unit digit is 2)

2 is the answer

Ramachandran said:
1 decade ago

not understand this problem

Dinesh said:
1 decade ago

hi khan this is dini,

unit digit means single number in product we have to take last digit in all product items and v have mutiply it v will get answer in tat last number is unit digit..eg:(4*8*7*3)=(672)=2 were 2 is the unit digit of 672 can u understand now..

unit digit means single number in product we have to take last digit in all product items and v have mutiply it v will get answer in tat last number is unit digit..eg:(4*8*7*3)=(672)=2 were 2 is the unit digit of 672 can u understand now..

Post your comments here:

Your comments will be displayed after verification.

Quick links

Quantitative Aptitude

Verbal (English)

Reasoning

Programming

Interview

Placement Papers

© IndiaBIX™ Technologies