Aptitude - Numbers - Discussion

Discussion :: Numbers - General Questions (Q.No.11)

11. 

5358 x 51 = ?

[A]. 273258
[B]. 273268
[C]. 273348
[D]. 273358

Answer: Option A

Explanation:

5358 x 51 = 5358 x (50 + 1)
= 5358 x 50 + 5358 x 1
= 267900 + 5358
= 273258.

Thulasiram.G said: (Jul 7, 2011)  
How it possible to multiply 51 by 5358, . ? can you please explain. It will be helpful for my placement.

Raghu Kumar said: (Jul 27, 2011)  
5358*5=267900+5358=273258

Onkar said: (Aug 26, 2011)  
5358 (10*5+1) =53580*5+5358=267900+5358=273258.

This is simplest method I hope you got.

Poornima Hassan said: (Aug 31, 2011)  
1.5358
5+3+5+8=21
2+1=3........(a)
2.5+1=6.....(b)
now
a*b
ie 3*6=18
1+8=9..........(rhs)
now come to lhs
2+7+3+2+5+8=27
2+7=9.....(lhs)
now
rhs=lhs
9=9
so ans is 273258

Sunil said: (Dec 11, 2011)  
I think, Cris Cross method is much simpler to all, as we start getting values from unit place so we dont have to find all the digits. Find one check the option, second number check the option, and so on..
5358
*0051
--------
(AL MULTIPICATION ARE DONE W.R.T LOWER NUMBER )
1) Unit place = 1*8 = 8 (Observe the option, all have 8 in
unit place, so carry on for next
value.)

2) tens place = (1*5 + 5*8) = 5+40 = 45 = 5
(put 5 in tens pace and 4 is carry for nxt
step if required)
answer till now is 58
(Check the options.....only 2 are with this
digits, so step 3....)

3) hundreds place = (1*3 + 0*8 + 5*5) = 3 + 25 + 4 = 32
(4 is carry from privous step.)
(Again put 2 in 100's pace and 3 as carry
for nxt step.)
answer till this stage is 258
(check the options.... only one option
matching this number so no
more calculation)
answer is A.

eg : if digits are abcd * wxyz
1) here (d*z) gives unit place number.
2) (z*c + y*d)gives tens place number.
3) (z*b + x*d + y*c) gives hundred place number.
4) (z*a + w*d + y*d + x*c)gives thousand number.
(OBSERVE THE TRICK)
5) (y*a + w*c + x*b) given nxt number to left.
6) (x*a + w*b) give nxt number.
7) (w*a) gives last number.
(Please note when ever you get CARRY from one STEP please add That Carry to The Step Followed after that step)
e.g: if step 1 results 57 as the answer put 7 at unit place and carry 5 to 2 step, add this five to 2 step result and so on...
if the explanation look wierd or trouble some please google vedic maths, and the name of this method is criss cross method.

Sankar J said: (May 15, 2012)  
5358*51

Just multiply by 50 and add that number one more time.

Base for 50 is 100:

For to multiply by 50 just divide the number by 2 and add two zero at last if number is even.

Given number is even number just divide that number by 2

5358/2=2679

Add two zero at last (because base is 100) 267900

267900+5358=273258

Sandesh said: (Aug 24, 2012)  
But why you directly multiply 5352*51?

Malay Biitm Bbsr said: (Mar 29, 2013)  
First step:5358*100 = 535800 .

2nd step:535800/2 = 267900.

3rd step:267900+5358 = 273258.

Rajesh said: (Sep 14, 2013)  
5000*50=250000 ! 5000*1=5000.
300*50= 15000 ! 300*1= 300.
50*50= 2500 ! 50*1= 50.
8*50= 400 ! 8*1= 8.
--------- -------
267900 + 5358 =273258.

Sisir said: (Sep 18, 2013)  
5358 x 51 = 5358 x (50 + 1).

= 5358 x 50 + 5358 x 1.

= 5358 x100/2+5358.

= 535800/2+5358.

= 267900+5358.

= 273258.

Kimi said: (Jan 10, 2016)  
Use the standard method that your elementary teacher teach you, I think it is much simpler, don't complicate things too much.

Vinodhini said: (Jun 29, 2016)  
(5358 * 100)/2 + (1 * 5358).

EXP: 51 = (50 + 1) = (100/2 + 1).
Therefore, 535800/2 = 267900.
1 * 5358 = 5358.
267900 + 5358 = 273258.

Madhusudan Das said: (Feb 22, 2018)  
Follow step by step.

5358 x 51 = 5358 x (50 + 1).
= 5358 x 50 + 5358 x 1
= 267900 + 5358
= 273258.

Md Ikramul Haque said: (Jul 24, 2018)  
5+3+5+8=21(2+1=3).
And 5+1=6 (6),
And then 6+3 = 9,
and = 2+7+3+2+5+8,
= 27.
2+7 = 9.

Post your comments here:

Name *:

Email   : (optional)

» Your comments will be displayed only after manual approval.